Montgomery v. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Antigone Montgomery
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Alza Corporation, Ivax LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Ivax Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C and Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv23380
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for a Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization. All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. This case is administratively closed. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Alza Corporation, Centocor Research & Development, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Transfer)(Walz, David)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Alza Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Attorney David J. Walz added to party Alza Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Centocor Research & Development, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Research & Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Johnson & Johnson (pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order 1 - Proposed Order)(Walz, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Antigone Montgomery (Albites, Francisco)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (pes)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Antigone Montgomery re #1 Complaint, Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint) (Albites, Francisco)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by Antigone Montgomery by Antigone Montgomery (Albites, Francisco)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice (Other). Document Not Captioned-MISSING NOTICE OF FILING; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (lk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Antigone Montgomery re #1 Complaint, Filing of Exhibits (Albites, Francisco)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Amended Summons to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. by Antigone Montgomery (Albites, Francisco)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. FKA Name was used on the Summons. (jbs)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alza Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., Ivax LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s))(jbs)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13348572, filed by Antigone Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) 1, #3 Summon(s) 2, #4 Summon(s) 3, #5 Summon(s) 4, #6 Summon(s) 5, #7 Summon(s) 6, #8 Summon(s) 7, #9 Summon(s) 8, #10 Summon(s) 9, #11 Summon(s) 10)(Albites, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centocor Research & Development, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antigone Montgomery
Represented By: Francisco Antonio Albites, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?