Myeress v. Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Virginie de roa Nieto P.A., Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC dba Keller Williams Elite Properties doing business as Keller Williams Elite Properties, Virginie de Roa Nieto and Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC doing business as Keller Williams Elite Properties
Case Number: 1:2020cv23409
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 FORM AO 121 and Order Mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Wirth, Craig)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by all Defendants by September 24, 2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Myeress. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC, Virginie de roa Nieto P.A., Virginie de Roa Nieto. Attorney Matthew Stanley Garnett added to party Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Stanley Garnett added to party Virginie de roa Nieto P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Stanley Garnett added to party Virginie de Roa Nieto(pty:dft). (Garnett, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Virginie de roa Nieto P.A. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Virginie de Roa Nieto served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC, Virginie de roa Nieto P.A., Virginie de Roa Nieto. (cds)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 and Complaint Mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC, Virginie de roa Nieto P.A., Virginie de Roa Nieto. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13362433, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginie de roa Nieto P.A.
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC dba Keller Williams Elite Properties doing business as Keller Williams Elite Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginie de Roa Nieto
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Professionals of Aventura LLC doing business as Keller Williams Elite Properties
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Meir Teitelbaum
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?