Patak et al v. Mejia et al
Plaintiff: Ramazan Patak and Globaltexusa LLC doing business as Globaltex Fine Linens
Defendant: Betty A. Mejia, Worldtex USA Corp and Erika B Mejia
Case Number: 1:2020cv23419
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Counsel., ( Deadline to obtain new counsel 9/11/2020.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (yha)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman (yha)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 NOT PAID, filed by Ramazan Patak, Globaltexusa LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(yha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patak et al v. Mejia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty A. Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldtex USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika B Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramazan Patak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globaltexusa LLC doing business as Globaltex Fine Linens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?