Restricted Filer - Harris v. Mr. Fugeo et al
Plaintiff: Willie G. Harris and Willie G. Restricted Filer - Harris
Defendant: Mrs. St. Clair and Mr. Fugeo
Case Number: 1:2020cv23420
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER. Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/ Case Closed by District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/28/2020. (daa)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Denying as moot #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie G. Harris. The Clerk is directed not to accept any future filings from Plaintiff unless Plaintiff either (1) pays the filing fee; (2) affirms under oath that he is in imminent threat of serious physical injury; (3) is represented by counsel; or (4) obtains leave of court to file. See Miller v. Donald, 541 F.3d 1091, 109697 (11th Cir. 2008). Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Willie G. Harris, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie G. Harris; Recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 1], be DISMISSED without prejudice; his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 3] be DENIED; and this case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie G. Harris. (drz)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (drz)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Mr. Fugeo, Mrs. St. Clair. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Willie G. Harris.(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restricted Filer - Harris v. Mr. Fugeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie G. Restricted Filer - Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Fugeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?