Ali v. Rolle et al
Plaintiff: Sharmarke Abdikadir Ali
Defendant: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Chad Wolf, Luis M. Rolle, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr and Shineka S. Miller
Case Number: 1:2020cv23421
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Georgia as case 7:20-cv-00170, filed 08/25/2020. (jua)
August 25, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-23421 electronically transferred out to Georgia Middle. (amb)
August 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE #7 Order. Closing Case. (amb)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. ORDER granting #6 Motion to Change Venue. This matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Venue by Sharmarke Abdikadir Ali. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Detention History)(Rodriguez, Cristina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Shineka S. Miller, Luis M. Rolle, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Chad Wolf. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Shineka S. Miller (pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Luis M. Rolle(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Warden of Immigration Detention Facility(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Noncompliance re: Failure to Electronically File New Civil Case. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2009-36, new civil complaints or other civil case initiating documents must be filed electronically (except for sealed or emergency matters which must be filed conventionally as set forth in the Administrative Order and CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). It is not necessary to re-file this document but future filings must comply with Administrative Order 2009-36 and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (jbs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (jbs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 (Complaint) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00, No IFP was Filed or Filing Fee Paid,, filed by Sharmarke Abdikadir Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Rolle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis M. Rolle
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka S. Miller
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharmarke Abdikadir Ali
Represented By: Cristina Boullon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?