Suri et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Praveen Suri and Meenakshi Suri
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23433
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Meenakshi Suri, Praveen Suri re #14 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing of Mediation on May 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Donner, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Rosa I. Rodriguez as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation)(Donner, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Witness List Plaintiffs' Amended Fact Witness List by Meenakshi Suri, Praveen Suri.. (Donner, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Witness List Plaintiffs' Fact Witness List by Meenakshi Suri, Praveen Suri.. (Donner, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Jamie Rebecca Combee added to party Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Combee, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/19/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 10/25/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Notice of Filing State Court Docket and Documents (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Notice of Interrogatory, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' Request for Production, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' Request to Schedule Depositions, #7 Exhibit G - 20 Day Summons, #8 Exhibit H - 20 Day Summons Issued to Liberty Mutual, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Combee, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Donner, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Combee, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Combee, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the amended complaint. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (mc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Praveen Suri, Meenakshi Suri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy)(Donner, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13369718, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lavisky, Matthew) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 8/18/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suri et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew John Lavisky
Represented By: Jamie Rebecca Combee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie Rebecca Combee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praveen Suri
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Donner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meenakshi Suri
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Donner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?