C.M. Forming Corp. v. Norguard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: C.M. Forming Corp.
Defendant: Norguard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23435
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by C.M. Forming Corp. (Garcia, Alejandro)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Norguard Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norguard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for Norguard Insurance Company (Leininger, Carri)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norguard Insurance Company (Leininger, Carri)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document, Norguard Insurance Company. Answer due 8/31/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Norguard Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Norguard Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Leininger, Carri) Modified Relief on 8/26/2020 (ls).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Norguard Insurance Company of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Leininger, Carri)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Norguard Insurance Company response to Complaint due 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (yha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (yha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13370250, filed by Norguard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Leininger, Carri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.M. Forming Corp. v. Norguard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Carri S. Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M. Forming Corp.
Represented By: Alejandro Franklin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?