Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026 et al v. U.S. Supreme Court Nine Justices
Plaintiff: XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens and Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026
Defendant: U.S. Supreme Court Nine Justices
Case Number: 1:2020cv23439
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Documents and Request from U.S. Court by Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026, XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens (cds)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Alter, Vacate, Amend Order and Correct re #6 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, ( Responses due by 10/23/2020) by Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026, XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/ Case Closed by District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/8/2020. (daa)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #3 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION Affidavit to #3 Report and Recommendations by Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026, XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens. (cds)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/Motion to Leave, and Add U.S Supreme Court "Order" and or; U.S Court of Louisiana "Order" and Authorization of "French Republic Gov" April/130 by Virtue "Act of U.S. Congress", May 26th 1821. by XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens (cds)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens, Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026; Recommending that this case [ECF No. 1] be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction when construed as a petition brought under 28 U.S.C. 2241, and DISMISSED as a three-striker pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) when construed as a complaint brought under 42 U.S.C. 1983. It is further recommended that this case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 Not Paid/No IFP, filed by Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026, XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026 et al v. U.S. Supreme Court Nine Justices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Supreme Court Nine Justices
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XYZ Indigenous Aboriginal 28,000 B.C. Natives American Citizens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al-Rabat Morocco Empire Kingdom Islamic Sovereignty Nation 37-1880026
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?