Walker v. Moody et al
Plaintiff: Willie Frank Walker
Defendant: Ashley Moody and Herbert Erving Walker III
Case Number: 1:2020cv23440
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appeal as to #7 Order Dismissing Case by Willie Frank Walker. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER the Amended Complaint, ECF No. #6 , is DISMISSED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ashley Moody, Herbert Erving Walker III, filed by Willie Frank Walker.(jbs)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Herbert Erving Walker III. (kpe)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The Complaint, ECF No. #1 , isDISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint asserting a basis for jurisdiction and relief by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/19/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100213962. (vt)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashley Moody, Herbert Erving Walker III. Filing fees $ 400.00,NOT PAID/NO IFP filed by Willie Frank Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summon(s))(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Moody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Erving Walker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Frank Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?