William v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Beverly William
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23442
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Temporary Stay. This case is STAYED for a period of 90 days. The Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Stay AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ocariz, Rebecca)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Steven S. Schulte. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/31/2020. (pb00)
August 28, 2020 Filing 35 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Schulte. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13431752 by Beverly William. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Zinns, Sharon)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sharon Jessica Zinns on behalf of Beverly William. Attorney Sharon Jessica Zinns added to party Beverly William(pty:pla). (Zinns, Sharon)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed #31 Motion For Substitution Of Counsel. Attorneys Jordan E. Jarreau, Jessica Junek and Melissa Dorman Matthews representing C R Bard Inc (Defendant) and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Defendant) and McKesson Corporation (Defendant) terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jordan Jarreau, Jessica Junek, Melissa Matthews. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 27, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Ocariz, Rebecca)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 Defendant's STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Rebecca A. Ocariz and Sabrina R. Gallo for Jordan E. Jarreau, Jessica Junek and Melissa Dorman Matthews by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ocariz, Rebecca)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Ocariz on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft). (Ocariz, Rebecca)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sabrina R. Gallo on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. Attorney Sabrina R. Gallo added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sabrina R. Gallo added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft). (Gallo, Sabrina)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER re #26 Bar Letter to counsel. In that none of the attorneys of record are members of the Southern District of Florida Bar, counsel shall move for admission pro hac vice pursuant to Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys no later than 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/20/2020. (pb00)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Eric Martin Przybysz, Darren McDowell, Steven Scott Schulte, Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E. Jarreau, Jessica Junek, mailing date 08/19/2020, (cco)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02283. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Joanne Burks's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2275-S opened); b. Plaintiff Billy Goodman's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2276-S opened); c. Plaintiff John Lewis's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2277-S opened); d. Plaintiff Deborah Melton's case be severed and transferred to the Florence Division of the District of South Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2278-S opened); e. Plaintiff Jolanda Pulliam's case be severed and transferred to the Cape Girardeau Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2279-S opened); f. Plaintiff Maria Terry's case be severed and transferred to the District of Columbia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2280-S opened); g. Plaintiff Emmitt Thomas's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2281-S opened); h. Plaintiff Melissa Tuttle's case be severed and transferred to the Buffalo Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2282-S opened); i. Plaintiff Beverly William's s case be severed and transferred to the Miami Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2283-S opened). Plaintiff Laverne Keeling is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr).
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01490-S. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (aaa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10899538) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued McKisson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Aff of Service to McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Executed Return of Service Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca Ocariz
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca Ocariz
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca Ocariz
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly William
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Sharon Jessica Zinns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?