Haddad v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ghassan Haddad
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23445
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Eric Kleinman. Mediation Hearing set for 1/25/2021 02:30 PM. Within seven (7) days of the mediation conference, the parties shall file a mediation report indicating whether all required parties were present, whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that on or before September 22, 2020, the parties shall e-mail a proposed order scheduling mediation to altonaga@flsd.uscourts.gov in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 First NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Eric S Kleinman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for January 25, 2021 at 2:30pm. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barimo, Elise)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Eric S Kleinman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for January 25, 2021, 2:30 p.m.. (Kleinman, Eric)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all applicable Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 7/29/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ghassan Haddad (Barimo, Elise)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Elise Belen Barimo re #11 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Elise Belen Barimo has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elise Belen Barimo (Barimo, Elise)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Trial Schedule and Deadlines)(Cespedes, Edgard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Cespedes, Edgard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Scottsdale Insurance Company of Filing State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Verified Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Cespedes, Edgard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Cespedes, Edgard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Cespedes, Edgard)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint by August 31, 2020, failing which the case will be remanded. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring a removal status report by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (yha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13375218, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cespedes, Edgard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haddad v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghassan Haddad
Represented By: Natasha Alexandra Rivera
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Edgard Kenneth Cespedes
Represented By: Ronald Lee Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?