Gonzalez v. El Mar Beach Apartments LLC
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Defendant: El Mar Beach Apartments LLC doing business as The El Mar Boutique Hotel
Case Number: 1:2020cv23450
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean J Trantalis on behalf of El Mar Beach Apartments LLC. Attorney Dean J Trantalis added to party El Mar Beach Apartments LLC(pty:dft). (Trantalis, Dean)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Order on Clerks Default Procedure. Copy of Order was mailed to Defendant. (jbs)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Clerks Default Procedure. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff's Certificate of Counsel regarding any prior filings of the Defendant under the Americans with Disabilities Act by Nolan Keith Klein on behalf of Jesus Gonzalez (Klein, Nolan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. El Mar Beach Apartments LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Klein, Nolan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order Requiring Verified Statement in ADA Case, and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to El Mar Beach Apartments LLC. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against El Mar Beach Apartments LLC d/b/a The El Mar Boutique Hotel. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13375906, filed by Jesus Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klein, Nolan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. El Mar Beach Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Mar Beach Apartments LLC doing business as The El Mar Boutique Hotel
Represented By: Dean J Trantalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By: Nolan Keith Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?