Elan International, Inc. v. Depositors Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elan International, Inc.
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23452
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. #8 . Upon review of the notice and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines and hearings are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/3/2020. (clu)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elan International, Inc. (Lopez, Javier)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Depositors Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #3 Defendant's motion to dismiss. THIS MATTER is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Defendant's motion #3 is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/28/2020. (clu)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practice In Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Depositors Insurance Company of Pendency of Other Actions (Keller, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Depositors Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Keller, Thomas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - 11th Judicial Circuit) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13376518, filed by Depositors Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Sunbiz Record, #4 Exhibit C - Property Loss Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Application, #6 Exhibit E - Audit, #7 Exhibit F - Policy)(Keller, Thomas) Text Modified on 8/19/2020 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elan International, Inc. v. Depositors Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elan International, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Florio
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Javier Asis Lopez
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Daniel Edward Tropin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?