Blackacre Land Trust, LLC v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Blackacre Land Trust, LLC
Defendant: Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies doing business as Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23455
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate ANTONIO BRYANT, Other Affiliate Black Acre LLC, Other Affiliate Nicon Contracting & Engineering, Inc., Other Affiliate Best Florida Roofers LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Goette, P.A., Other Affiliate Robert Goette, Other Affiliate Best Choice Public Adjusters Group, LLC for Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) filed by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit C)(Goette, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Dickenson, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Ryan Goette on behalf of Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. (kou)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number FLSDC-13376948, filed by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies d/b/a Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackacre Land Trust, LLC v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies doing business as Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: John David Dickenson
Represented By: Chad A. Pasternack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackacre Land Trust, LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Goette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?