Perez-Sera v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: MARIA PEREZ-SERA and Maria Prez-Sera
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv23463
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Michael J. Drahos added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/27/2020 (Drahos, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maria Prez-Sera. Carnival Corporation served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gander, Deborah)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (jas)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by MARIA PEREZ-SERA (Gander, Deborah)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13378649, filed by MARIA PEREZ-SERA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gander, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Sera v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Drahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA PEREZ-SERA
Represented By: Deborah J Gander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Prez-Sera
Represented By: Deborah J Gander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?