Juul Labs, Inc. v. Doral Service Station, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Midflagler Service Station, LLC and DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv23473
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 22, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC, Midflagler Service Station, LLC. Attorney Ignacio Urbieta added to party DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ignacio Urbieta added to party Midflagler Service Station, LLC (pty:dft). (Urbieta, Ignacio)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Randall J. Clement is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Clement at randy@clementandholaw.com.. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Randall J. Clement. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13424949 by Juul Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Litchford, Hal)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC, Midflagler Service Station, LLC. (mc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (Corrected) by Juul Labs, Inc. re #1 Complaint, filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Litchford, Hal)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (Corrected) by Juul Labs, Inc. re #1 Complaint, filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Litchford, Hal)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata Correcting the Caption of Complaint for Trademark Infringement, False Designation or Origin , and Unfair Competition by Juul Labs, Inc. re #3 Form AO 120/121, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued (Litchford, Hal) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (jas).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC, Midflagler Service Station, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ebz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13384122, filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(Litchford, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Doral Service Station, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midflagler Service Station, LLC
Represented By: Ignacio Urbieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORAL SERVICE STATION, LLC
Represented By: Ignacio Urbieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall J. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?