Crayne v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Crayne
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23500
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Staying and Administratively Closing Case Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization. Granting #12 Motion to Stay. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of Partial Dismissal as to Defendants Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. This case shall remain openas the Plaintiff has not dismissed this case as to Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #16 Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Plaintiff's amended complaint. This action is the subject of a separate motion that is pending before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. That motion seeks to transfer this and other actions to the District of New Jersey and to consolidate pretrial proceedings. The Defendant's response to the amended complaint shall be filed no later than 14 days after the Court rules on #12 the Defendant's motion for a stay of all proceedings pending a decision on multi-district litigation centralization. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Walz, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Evelyn Crayne. Replies due by 10/20/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Walz, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Courtesy Copy of Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation In Re: ELMIRON (Pentosan Polysulfate Sodium) Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Schedule of Related Actions, #3 Proof of Service)(mc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Johnson & Johnson (pty:dft). Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walz, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. by Evelyn Crayne (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (lk)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Striking. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Evelyn Crayne re #3 Summons Issued, (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entry #3 by Evelyn Crayne (Cohen, Jonathan) Modified/Added link on 9/10/2020 (lk).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Evelyn Crayne.(Cohen, Jonathan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Amended Complaint (Amended Complaint due by 9/1/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(jbs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13392696, filed by Evelyn Crayne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s))(Cohen, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crayne v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Crayne
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?