Riviere v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Riviere
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation and Health Options, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23709
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 29, 2020 Filing 29 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 28 . Document Restricted Due to Error. (fbn)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ( Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/10/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judge Jonathan Goodman for discovery matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/26/2021.) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 27, 2020 Filing 26 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Health Options, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Scheduling Order)(Hooker, Valerie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Maria Riviere (Varnell, Janet)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Health Options, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. (Hooker, Valerie)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Defendants have through and including November 9, 2020 to file a combined response or separate answers to Plaintiffs Collective Action Complaint. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria Riviere. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 14, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Health Options, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Hooker, Valerie)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 Clerks Notice to Filer re #20 Notice of Attorney Appearance,,. Attorney Did Not Associate additional attorneys; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate additional attorneys to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (cqs)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Health Options, Inc.. Attorney Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris added to party GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris added to party Health Options, Inc.(pty:dft). (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Compliance by Maria Riviere re #6 Order to Show Cause, (Varnell, Janet)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 and #17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Rachhana T. Srey and Caroline E. Bressman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/2/2020. (jzn)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Caroline E. Bressman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13626257 by Maria Riviere. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rachhana T. Srey. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13626240 by Maria Riviere. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maria Riviere. GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Varnell, Janet)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maria Riviere. Health Options, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Varnell, Janet)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 , #11 , and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Camille F. Rodriguez, Krysten L. Connon, and Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/25/2020. (jzn)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for 1.Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13583963 by Maria Riviere. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Krysten L. Connon. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13583946 by Maria Riviere. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Camille F. Rodriguez. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13583925 by Maria Riviere. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Although Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. is not required to file a response to the Complaint until all Defendants have been served, Defendant's counsel shall file a notice of appearance no later than October 13, 2020, or a Clerk's default may be entered against it. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 10/27/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maria Riviere. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Varnell, Janet)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before December 3, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of: Claim by Maria Riviere re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Varnell, Janet)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Settlement Conference. Statement of Claim due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Health Options, Inc.. (cds)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13470596, filed by Maria Riviere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Varnell, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riviere v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Ann Simpson
Represented By: Valerie Lorraine Hooker
Represented By: Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation
Represented By: Amanda Ann Simpson
Represented By: Valerie Lorraine Hooker
Represented By: Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Options, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Ann Simpson
Represented By: Valerie Lorraine Hooker
Represented By: Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Riviere
Represented By: Janet Robards Varnell
Represented By: Caroline E. Bressman
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: Brian William Warwick
Represented By: Rachhana Thach Srey
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?