SANCHEZ MALPICA v. United States Justice Department et al
Plaintiff: JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA
Defendant: United States Justice Department, Dir. Timothy J Shea, United States Of America, Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Dept. Of, John Doe 1-5, Drug Enforcement Administration and Acting Administrator of the Drug Enforcement Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv23745
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Notice (Other). Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (pes)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Acting Administrator of the Drug Enforcement Administration, John Doe 1-5, Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Justice Department, United States Of America, U.S. Attorney (pes)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA FILING EXHIBITS A-C REFERENCED IN COMPLAINT (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) D.E.A. Timothy J Shea by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Drug Enforcement Administration by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) USA by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) US JUSTICE DEPT. by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) D.E.A. John Doe 1-5 by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) D.E.A. by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Timothy J. Shea by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA (Richardson, Lonnie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (jao)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13491401, filed by JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET, #2 Summon(s) SUMMONS, #3 Summon(s) SUMMONS, #4 Summon(s) SUMMONS, #5 Summon(s) SUMMONS, #6 Summon(s) SUMMONS)(Richardson, Lonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ MALPICA v. United States Justice Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN JOSE SANCHEZ MALPICA
Represented By: Lonnie Brian Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Justice Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir. Timothy J Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Dept. Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Administrator of the Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?