Nunez et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr. and Alex Nunez
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24020
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc. (Holt, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by American Airlines, Inc.. Attorney Michael Aaron Holt added to party American Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex Nunez, Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr.. American Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Pelier, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (jbs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr., Alex Nunez (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Pelier, Robert)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr., Alex Nunez Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pelier, Robert)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (scn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Mediated Settlement Agreement and for Other Relief against American Airlines, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13618687, filed by Alex Nunez, Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Preamble, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Grievance Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Opinion and Award Letter)(Pelier, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinaldo Acosta Vega, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nelson Pelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Nunez
Represented By: Robert Nelson Pelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?