1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East v. Dejoy et al
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East
Defendant: Louis Dejoy and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv24069
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order of Dismissal. Closing Case. Denied as Moot: #28 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 13, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Hernandez, Igor)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter is before the Court upon an independent review of the record. The Plaintiff initiated this matter on October 6, 2020, seeking certain changes to USPS procedures and delivery standards in the state of Florida prior to the November 3, 2020 election. #1 . The Plaintiff amended its complaint on October 16, 2020 #27 , and that same day, filed an emergency motion for preliminary injunction #28 . Followings several hearings, the Court issued four non-final orders on the Plaintiff's emergency motion addressing certain concerns raised by the Plaintiff. As election day has now passed, the Court orders the Plaintiff, by November 16, 2020, to show cause why this matter should not be denied as moot, given the conclusion of the election. Alternatively, if the Plaintiff wishes to abandon prosecution of this matter, the Court directs the Plaintiff to file a notice of voluntary dismissal, consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), by that same date. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
November 4, 2020 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of status conference held on 11/3/20 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-7 pages, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2021. (tnr)
November 4, 2020 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of status conference held on 11/2/20 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-27 pages, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2021. (tnr)
November 3, 2020 Filing 65 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Status Conference held on 11/3/2020 via Zoom Meeting. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jonathan Manes, David J. Bradford, and Joseph Evan Borson, principal participants. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Igor)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Fourth Non-Final Order on the Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. See attached document for full details. (sda)
November 2, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of Louis Dejoy, United States Postal Service. Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Louis Dejoy(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft). (Cholera, Kuntal)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference for 11/3/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Join ZoomGov Meeting:https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611149457?pwd=ZVRrNzdybE5tRUsyUGYybnZVZ2pWUT09 Meeting ID: 161 114 9457 and Passcode: 608715 Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/2/2020. (jh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 60 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Continuation of Status Conference re Motions held on 11/2/2020 via Zoom Meeting. Further status conference scheduled for Tuesday 11/03/2020 at 10:30 AM via Zoom meeting. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jonathan Manes, David J. Bradford, and Joseph Borson, principal participants. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 59 REPORT REGARDING All Clear Reports and Issues to be Discussed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Igor)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE BY VIDEOCONFERENCE: As stated in the Court's third non-final order on the Plaintiff's emergency motion for preliminary injunction #56 , the Court has scheduled a status conference in this matter for November 2, 2020 at 5:30 PM. All attendees must join the hearing 5 minutes prior to the start time. Credentials for the conference are as follows: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611149457?pwd=ZVRrNzdybE5tRUsyUGYybnZVZ2pWUT09. Meeting ID: 161 114 9457. Passcode: 608715. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
November 2, 2020 Filing 57 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Status Conference re Motions held on 11/2/2020 via Zoom meeting. Further Status Conference set for 5:30 PM on 11/2/2020 via Zoom Meeting ID 161 114 9457 and Passcode 608715. Total time in court: 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David J. Bradford, and Joseph Evan Borson, principal participants. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Third Non-Final Order on the Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 2, 2020 Filing 55 REPORT REGARDING Nov 2 2020 Status Conference by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Igor)
October 29, 2020 Filing 54 Corrected Transcript as to date only and Notice of Correction of hearing held on 10/28/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-34 pages, re: #53 Transcript,, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (tnr)
October 29, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 10/28/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-34 pages, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021. (tnr)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Second Non-Final Order on the Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Deferring ruling re #49 Report Regarding filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East ( Status Conference Re: Motions set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
October 28, 2020 Filing 51 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Continuation of Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2020 via Zoom meeting re #28 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Motion taken under advisement. Status Conference via Zoom scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 9:00 AM. Zoom meeting ID number and passcode will be sent to parties by separate order. Dale Ewart present. Total time in court: 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David J. Bradford, and Joseph Evan Borson, addressed the Court. Steven Art, Igor Hernandez, Jonathan Manes, Nayiri K. Pilikyan, Ashley M. Schumacher, Daniel J. Weiss, Kuntal Cholera, Allyson Belovin, Michael Weaver, Carolina Bolado, Katie Roberson Young, Stephan Boardman, and Alice Covington. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT Supplemental signed by: Jonathan Manes by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Hernandez, Igor)
October 27, 2020 Filing 49 REPORT REGARDING 10/21/2020 Hearing Order by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Igor)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING CONTINUATION OF HEARING BY VIDEOCONFERENCE: Consistent with this Court's non-final order on the Plaintiff's emergency motion for preliminary injunction #47 , the Court has scheduled a continuation of its hearing on the Plaintiff's motion for October 28, 2020 at 9:00 AM. All attendees must join the hearing 5 minutes prior to the start time. Credentials for the hearing are as follows: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1602140083?pwd=aHZxekgwOW5kUm00eFU1QkRWTjNRZz09. Meeting ID: 160 214 0083. Passcode: 040525. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 23, 2020 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 10/22/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-41 pages, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (tnr)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Non-Final Order on the Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to #28 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION .( Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2020 at 09:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ( Settlement Agreement due by 10/27/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 22, 2020 Filing 45 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2020 re #28 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East via Zoom meeting. Deadline set for 3:00 PM on 10/27/2020 for the parties to submit briefs in advance of the hearing, or provide notice to the Court that there are no remaining issues for resolution. Hearing continued to 10/28/2020 at 9:00 AM via Zoom meeting. By agreement of the parties, exhibits 1-30 were admitted. Exhibits filed electronically - see docket entries #28 , #43 , and #44 . Declaration of Daniel A. Smith #28 -2 and Dale Ewart #28 -3 are admitted. Dale Ewart present. Total time in court: one hour. Attorneys Appearances: David J. Bradford, and Joseph Evan Borson, addressed the Court. Steven Art, Jonathan Manes, Nayiri K. Pilikyan, Ashley M. Schumacher, Daniel J. Weiss, Igor Hernandez, Michael Weaver, Aaron Leibowitz, Kuntal Cholera, Christopher Sheehan, Joseph Borson, W. Michael Hughes, Daniel Smith, Alexis Echols, Allyson Belovin, Katie Roberson Young, Stephan Boardman, and Felipe D. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jh).
October 21, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by Louis Dejoy, United States Postal Service. Replies due by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 01 - USPS FY2019 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 02 - DeJoy Statement, #4 Exhibit 03 - PI Orders, #5 Exhibit 04 - Clarifying Operational Instructions, #6 Exhibit 05 - Sept. 24 Stand-Up Talk, #7 Exhibit 06 - Oct. 16 Stand-Up Talk, #8 Exhibit 07 - Additional Election Mail Resources Mem., #9 Exhibit 08 - Supplemental Guidance Mem., #10 Exhibit 09 - Extraordinary Measures Mem., #11 Exhibit 10 - OIG Report, #12 Exhibit Declaration Cover Page, #13 Exhibit Cintron Dec, #14 Exhibit Supp. Cintron Dec., #15 Exhibit Colin Dec., #16 Exhibit Costello Dec., #17 Exhibit Curtis Dec., #18 Exhibit DeChambeau Dec., #19 Exhibit Glass Dec.)(Borson, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Steve Art re #28 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Igor)
October 21, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of Louis Dejoy, United States Postal Service. Attorney Joseph Evan Borson added to party Louis Dejoy(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Evan Borson added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft). (Borson, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING HEARING BY VIDEOCONFERENCE: This matter is before the Court upon the Plaintiff's emergency motion for preliminary injunction. #28 . In its motion, the Plaintiff requested the Court hold a hearing on its emergency motion on or before October 23, 2020. In consideration of the Plaintiff's request, the Court has scheduled a hearing in this matter which will occur via Zoom on October 22, 2020 at 11:00 AM. All attendees must join the hearing 5 minutes prior to the start time. Credentials for the hearing are as follows: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1600218945?pwd=V2dzcEg5RDNNbThXTmRCMWVCZ2VEQT09. Meeting ID: 160 021 8945. Passcode: 646943. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 21, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings Miscellaneous Hearing set for 10/22/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. (sda)
October 20, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East re #28 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East re #27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. United States Postal Service served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Louis Dejoy served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. United States Postal Service served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Louis Dejoy served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 Clerks Notice to Filer re #25 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #26 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #24 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Uncomfirmed Service Date Entered; ERROR - ERROR - The unconfirmed service date was entered. The correction was NOT made by the Clerk. It is necessary to refile this document showing the "Green Card" as proof of service date. (cqs)
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 Summons Returned Executed, #20 Summons Returned Executed, #23 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #19 Summons Returned Executed, #22 Summons Returned Executed. Unconfirmed Service Date Entered; ERROR - The unconfirmed service date was entered. The correction was NOT made by the Clerk. It is necessary to refile this document showing the "Green Card" as proof of service date. (cqs)
October 16, 2020 Filing 28 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East.(Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. United States Postal Service served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Louis Dejoy served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (Hernandez, Igor)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's motion to appear pro hac vice. #15 . Attorney Daniel Weiss is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of 1199 SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. The Clerk is directed to provide the attorney Daniel Weiss with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel Weiss. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13653159 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Louis Dejoy, United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's motions to appear pro hac vice. [4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11]. Attorneys Ashley Schumacher, David Bradford, Nayiri Pilikyan, Jonathan Manes, Julia Rickert, Steven Art, Gayle Horn, and Anand Swaminathan are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. The Clerk is directed to provide the attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the respective motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s)) (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anand Swaminathan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643811 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gayle Horn. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643798 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Art. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643783 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Julia Rickert. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643778 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan Manes. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643765 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nayiri Pilikyan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643759 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Bradford. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643751 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ashley Schumacher. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13643390 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Hernandez, Igor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Louis Dejoy and United States Postal Service(cds)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13642112, filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons Dejoy, #3 Summon(s) Summons Postal Service)(Hernandez, Igor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East v. Dejoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dejoy
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East
Represented By: Steven Art
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Julia Rickert
Represented By: Nayiri K. Pilikyan
Represented By: Anand Swaminathan
Represented By: Gayle Horn
Represented By: Igor Hernandez
Represented By: Ashley M. Schumacher
Represented By: Jonathan Manes
Represented By: Daniel J. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?