Lucius v. Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Defendant: Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24166
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment and Default Final Judgment and Application for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expert Witness Fees, and Litigation Expenses and Memorandum of Law (Verified) by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Expert Summary and CV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of J. Courtney Cunningham, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Cunningham, Juan)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Verified Motion for Default and Default Final Judgment. Plaintiff has until December 3, 2020 to file a renewed motion for default judgment with a well-supported proposed order, containing a discussion of the applicable law and facts admitted by virtue of Defendant's default and proposed default judgment. The proposed order must be emailed to the Court and filed on the public docket as an attachment to the motion. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Sample Order) (wc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment and Default Final Judgment and Application for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expert Witness Fees, and Litigation Expenses and Memorandum of Law (Verified) by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Expert Summary and CV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of J. Courtney Cunningham, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Cunningham, Juan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Plaintiff, Windy Lucius's Verified Motion for Default and Default Final Judgment. Plaintiff must refile her motion accompanied by a proposed order and proposed final judgment by November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment and Default Final Judgment and Application for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expert Witness Fees, and Litigation Expenses and Memorandum of Law (Verified) by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Expert Summary and CV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of J. Courtney Cunningham, Esq.)(Cunningham, Juan)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff, Windy Lucius, must file a response by November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Entry of Default as to Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd. - Motions Terminated: #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/16/2020. (ls)
November 15, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd. by Windy Lucius. (Cunningham, Juan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Defendant, Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd., shall answer the Complaint on or before November 12, 2020, failing which Plaintiff is instructed to file a motion for clerks entry of default by November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 11/20/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd. served on 10/17/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Cunningham, Juan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windy Lucius identifying Other Affiliate ADASure for Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd. (scn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13675555, filed by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucius v. Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche-Bobois U.S.A., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?