Morehead v. Kahn et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Morehead
Defendant: Richard Kahn and Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24224
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER CLOSING CASE. On November 18, 2020, the Parties filed a #14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, wherein they dismissed the case with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Eleventh Circuit has stated that "the plain language of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) requires that a stipulation filed pursuant to that subsection is self-executing and dismisses the case upon its becoming effective. The stipulation becomes effective upon filing unless it explicitly conditions its effectiveness on a subsequent occurrence. District courts need not and may not take action after the stipulation becomes effective because the stipulation dismisses the case and divests the district court of jurisdiction." Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Because the Parties' Stipulation did not "explicitly condition[] its effectiveness on a subsequent occurrence," id., this Court no longer has jurisdiction over this case, and accordingly, this case is CLOSED, effective November 18, 2020, the date the Parties filed their Stipulation of Dismissal. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/18/2020. (gie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Claudia Morehead (Green, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 26, 2020, Plaintiff filed Returns of Service indicating that Defendants #11 Richard Kahn and #12 Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. were served on October 22, 2020. Over twenty-one days have now passed, and Defendants have not filed a response. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to file a Motion for Default or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/13/2020. (gie)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Claudia Morehead. Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. served on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Green, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Claudia Morehead. Richard Kahn served on 10/22/2020. (Green, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. (drz)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richard Kahn. (drz)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. by Claudia Morehead (Green, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Richard Kahn by Claudia Morehead (Green, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Claudia Morehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Green, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Claudia Morehead re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Green, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Kahn and Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13699475, filed by Claudia Morehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Green, Michael) Modified text on 10/15/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehead v. Kahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Morehead
Represented By: George S. LeMieux
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?