Zhejiang Jinko Solar Co., Ltd. v. Thesan USA Corp.
Plaintiff: ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD.
Defendant: THESAN USA CORP.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24346
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Thesan USA Corp.. (ls)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD. re #1 Complaint filed by ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD. (Mazzola, Jean-Claude)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters and NOTICE of Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel / Civil Cover Sheet by Jean-Claude Mazzola on behalf of ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD. (Mazzola, Jean-Claude)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (scn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Zhejiang Jinko Solar Co. Ltd. v. Thesan USA Corp. against THESAN CORP. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13739537, filed by ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD.(Mazzola, Jean-Claude) Text Modified on 10/22/2020. (scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhejiang Jinko Solar Co., Ltd. v. Thesan USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO. LTD.
Represented By: Jean-Claude Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THESAN USA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?