Forster v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: HELEN FORSTER
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24394
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by Helen Forster (Smith, Christopher)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 11/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Helen Forster. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Smith, Christopher)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (jas)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13760126, filed by HELEN FORSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forster v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN FORSTER
Represented By: Christopher Bond Smith
Represented By: John Heyward Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?