David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC v. R&S Export & Import, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC
Defendant: Rabbynath Rampersaid, R&S Export & Import, Inc., Shivash Rampersaid, Rabbynath Rampersad, Rabby Rampersad and Shivash Rampersad
Case Number: 1:2020cv24408
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against R&S Export & Import, Inc., Shivash Rampersad, Rabbynath Rampersad, filed by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC.(Berman, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by R&S Export & Import, Inc., Shivash Rampersad, Rabbynath Rampersad. Responses due by 12/17/2020 (Henkel, Timothy)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Responses due by 12/3/2020 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R&S Export & Import, Inc. (Henkel, Timothy)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #10 Summons Returned Executed,, by R&S Export & Import, Inc., Shivash Rampersad, Rabbynath Rampersad. Attorney Timothy Dean Henkel added to party R&S Export & Import, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Dean Henkel added to party Shivash Rampersad(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Dean Henkel added to party Rabbynath Rampersad (pty:dft). Responses due by 12/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henkel, Timothy)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC. R&S Export & Import, Inc. served on 11/5/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Shivash Rampersad served on 10/31/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Rabbynath Rampersad served on 10/31/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for R&S Export & Import, #2 Affidavit of Service for Rabbynath Rampersad, #3 Affidavit of Service for Shivash Rampersad)(Berman, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Grandview Brokerage, LLC, Other Affiliate Total Produce PLC, Other Affiliate ENZA Fruit New Zealand International Limited, Other Affiliate T&G Global Limited for David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC (Berman, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to R&S Export & Import, Inc., Shivash Rampersad, Rabbynath Rampersad. (pcs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC (Berman, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) For All Three Defendants by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC (Berman, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Berman, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13765715, filed by David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC.(Berman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC v. R&S Export & Import, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer and Company I, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbynath Rampersaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&S Export & Import, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Dean Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivash Rampersaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbynath Rampersad
Represented By: Timothy Dean Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabby Rampersad
Represented By: Timothy Dean Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivash Rampersad
Represented By: Timothy Dean Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?