All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp. v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp.
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv24500
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by GEICO Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Magistrate Election Form)(Marino, John)
December 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, GEICO Indemnity Company, shall have up through and including January 12, 2021, to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #11 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Marino, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp. for dates of December 19, 2020 - January 11, 2021 (Coyle, Melisa)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp.. (Coyle, Melisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Melisa Lee Coyle (Coyle, Melisa)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 30, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the Amended Complaint #7 . Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Indemnity Company, filed by All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment of Benefits)(Coyle, Melisa)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GEICO Indemnity Company. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (Marino, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order)(Marino, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13800253, filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composit Exhibit A)(Marino, John)(No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 11/3/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp. v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen L. Wenger
Represented By: Edward Keenan Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All X-Ray Diagnostic Services Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth John Dorchak
Represented By: Melisa Lee Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?