Richardson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Richardson
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv24741
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Michael Richardson (Dabdoub, Edward)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michael Richardson (Attachments: #1 A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company shall file a response to #1 the Complaint on or before January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/15/2020. (btn)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Shutts & Bowen LLP, Other Affiliate Jonathan M. fordin for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Attorney Jonathan Matthew Fordin added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fordin, Jonathan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael Richardson. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Service of Process)(Dabdoub, Edward)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (amb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13881586, filed by Michael Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Fordin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richardson
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Kevin P Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?