Canales v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Melody Canales
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv24758
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance of Schedule for Expert Disclosures and Depositions by Melody Canales re #11 Scheduling Order,,, (Margulies, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Elisabeth M. Rock Mediation Hearing set for 3/24/2021 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Elisabeth M. Rock as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 03/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Margulies, Jason)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/8/2021. In Limine Motions due by 7/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2021. Motions due by 7/2/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/9/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 9/8/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Melody Canales (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Margulies, Jason)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Tejera, Valentina)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Tejera, Valentina)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valentina M. Tejera on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Valentina M. Tejera added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Tejera, Valentina)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melody Canales. Carnival Corporation served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Margulies, Jason)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/11/2020) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (pcs)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-13887957, payment transferred from : 20CV24757, filed by Melody Canales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Margulies, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canales v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Valentina M. Tejera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Canales
Represented By: Daniel Wayne Grammes
Represented By: Andrew Scott Freedman
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?