Santos et al v. The Toro Company, et al
Plaintiff: Dora Gomez and Jose Santos
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc., a Foreign Profit Corporation, The Toro Company, a Foreign Profit Corporation, Lakeira Ingham, The Toro Company and Home Depot USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24830
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2021. Counsel of record present. Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mso)
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 Transmittal Letter Sent to: 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County. State Court Case Number: 19-017490 CA 09 (jbs)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REMANDING CASE Granting #14 Motion to Remand to State Court. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER. This matter is before the Court on #14 Plaintiffs' motion to remand. A telephonic hearing on #14 the motion is SET for January 8, 2021 at 11:00 AM. To participate, dial: 1-888-684-8852 and use access Code: 7369700# and security code: 1133. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/28/2020. (clu)
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dora Gomez, Jose Santos. (Katzen, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by The Toro Company of Serving Response to Plaintiff's' Request for Admissions (Golden, John)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 First RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by The Toro Company. (Golden, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by The Toro Company. Replies due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Ingham's Consent to Removal of Civil Action, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 - Home Depot's consent to Removal of Civil Action)(Golden, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Toro Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Golden, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Toro Company (Golden, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Joint Conference Report by The Toro Company (Golden, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Dora Gomez, Jose Santos. Attorney Elizabeth Sarah Katzen added to party Dora Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Sarah Katzen added to party Jose Santos(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File and Serve Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Verified Return of Service - The Toro Company, #4 Exhibit D-Verified Return of Service - Lakeira Ingham)(Katzen, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by The Toro Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A)(Golden, John)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by The Toro Company Notice of Filing All Relevant Docket Entries from Underlying State Court Per Court Order of Referral and Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Lakeira Inghams Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Defendant Toro Companys Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in Plf's Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Defendant Toro Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Defendant Home Depots Motion to Strike Certain Allegations of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Defendant Home Depots Answers to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Civil Summons on defendants, #7 Exhibit Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Verified Return of Service on Toro, #10 Exhibit Verified Return of Service on Lakeira Ingham, #11 Exhibit Defendant Home Depots Response to Plaintiffs Revised Motion for Leave to Serve and File Second Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs Revised Motion for Leave to File and Serve Second Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit Plaintiffs Revised Motion for Leave to File and Serve Second Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit Home Depots Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Co, #15 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Home Depots Affirmative Defenses, #16 Exhibit Home Depots Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit Order on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #18 Exhibit Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and Motion to Strike Punitive Damages, #19 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, #20 Exhibit Defendant Home Depots Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for More Definite Statement, #21 Exhibit Summons, and Complaint) (Golden, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice. Event incorrectly filed - Document contains multiple Motions; ERROR - A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. Per Chambers - motions must be filed separately and not as attachments to a notice. Filer must refile the motions separately. (sk)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Law Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in Plf's Second Amended Complaint by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plfs' Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit CPSC Recall Notice)(Golden, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law Toro Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by The Toro Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plfs' Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Golden, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Lakeira Ingham's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Lakeira Ingham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plfs' Second Amended Complaint)(Golden, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by The Toro Company Notice of Filing Motions Pending on Removal or Transfer to This Court Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Golden, John)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Toro Company of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Golden, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jbs)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Toro Company (Golden, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - The Toro Company's Notice of Removal to US District Court for the Southern District of Florida) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13915644, filed by The Toro Company, a Foreign Profit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Golden, John) (Answer Filed) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. The Toro Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc., a Foreign Profit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toro Company, a Foreign Profit Corporation
Represented By: John Dennis Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeira Ingham
Represented By: John Dennis Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toro Company
Represented By: John Dennis Golden
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Dennis Golden
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Gomez
Represented By: Elizabeth Sarah Katzen
Represented By: John Robert Clarke
Represented By: Jerry B. Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santos
Represented By: Elizabeth Sarah Katzen
Represented By: John Robert Clarke
Represented By: Jerry B. Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?