Acheron Portfolio Trust et al v. MUKAMAL
Plaintiff: AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST and Acheron Portfolio Trust
Defendant: BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the MUTUAL BENEFITS KEEP POLICY TRUST and Barry Mukamal
Case Number: 1:2020cv25025
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. § 0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Daniel R Lazaro (Lazaro, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Motion to Dismiss set for 2/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 2/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (osd)
January 26, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, and Request for Hearing filed by Barry Mukamal. (Arrastia, John)
January 26, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angelo Michael Castaldi on behalf of Barry Mukamal. Attorney Angelo Michael Castaldi added to party Barry Mukamal(pty:dft). (Castaldi, Angelo)
January 26, 2021 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Corrected to link other interested parties by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST identifying Other Affiliate Litai Assets, LLC, Other Affiliate Jan-Eric Samuel, Other Affiliate Aaron Smith, Other Affiliate KapilaMukamal, LLP, Other Affiliate Proactive Technologies LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Edelstein, Other Affiliate Jean-Michel Paul for ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST (Lazaro, Daniel)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 Clerks Notice to Filer re #19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Lee Rosendorf on behalf of Barry Mukamal. Attorney David Lee Rosendorf added to party Barry Mukamal(pty:dft). (Rosendorf, David)
January 25, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barry Mukamal (Arrastia, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST re #14 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,,, Joint Explanation Regarding Scheduling Report Requirement (Lazaro, Daniel)
January 25, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST (Soto, Miranda)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, and Request for Hearing filed by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Litai Complaint, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Bryan Cooper)(Lazaro, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and a report and recommendation on all dispositive matters. Referring to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss Defendant Barry Mukamal's #13 Motion to Dismiss Petition to Compel Arbitration and Request for Hearing. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
January 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss added PTN per Order DE 17 . Motions referred to Judge Jared M. Strauss. (mf)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Telephonic Status Conference held on January 13, 2021. Attorney Appearances: Larry Ivan Glick, Miranda Lundeen Soto, Steven L. Schreckinger, and John Arrastia, Jr. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jsi)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Barry Mukamal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Docket Entries for SEC proceeding, #2 Exhibit List of Docket Entries for Acheron v. Mukamal) (Arrastia, John)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before January 25, 2021, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, and Request for Hearing by Barry Mukamal. Attorney John Arrastia, Jr added to party Barry Mukamal(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Arrastia, John)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference on January 13, 2021, at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 888-273-3658; Access Code 7032614; Security Code 5170. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Telephonic Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney Steven L. Schreckinger is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust, Styx Portfolio Trust, and Acheron Capital, Ltd., for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Schreckinger at sschreckinger@andersonkreiger.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST re #9 Summons Issued, #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, of Acceptance of Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lazaro, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Barry Mukamal. (jao)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST, Acheron Portfolio Trust, LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST re #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, filed by Acheron Portfolio Trust. Attorney Daniel R Lazaro added to party ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel R Lazaro added to party AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel R Lazaro added to party LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel R Lazaro added to party STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Lazaro, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Lazaro on behalf of Acheron Portfolio Trust. Attorney Daniel R Lazaro added to party Acheron Portfolio Trust(pty:pla). (Lazaro, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven L. Schreckinger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14022170 by AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Miranda)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Acheron Portfolio Trust (Glick, Larry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven L. Schreckinger, mailing date 12/10/2020, (cco)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) to Compel Arbitration and Request for Hearing Arbitration. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14007513, filed by Acheron Portfolio Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Glick, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acheron Portfolio Trust et al v. MUKAMAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry Ivan Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD.
Represented By: Larry Ivan Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry Ivan Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST
Represented By: Larry Ivan Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acheron Portfolio Trust
Represented By: Larry Ivan Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the MUTUAL BENEFITS KEEP POLICY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Mukamal
Represented By: John Arrastia, Jr.
Represented By: David Lee Rosendorf
Represented By: Angelo Michael Castaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?