Harris v. Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Plaintiff: Jesse Harris
Defendant: Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Case Number: 1:2020cv25125
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's request for payment. #9 As this matter has been dismissed and closed, Plaintiff's request is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/8/2021. (sgi)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Jesse Harris to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: JesseHarris8851@gmail.com (ls)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 STRICKEN - REQUEST for Payment by Jesse Harris. (ls) Modified/Stricken per DE 11 on 1/8/2021 (pes).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In light of the Court's Order #5 Plaintiff's motion is DENIED AS MOOT. This case remains CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/18/2020. (sgi)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying #3 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Order Of Dismissal. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (DE 3) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Complaint (DE 1) is DISMISSED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Harris. (kpe)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing re Motion to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs & Summons by Jesse Harris. (kpe)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corrected Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) Text Modified on 12/17/2020 (amb).
December 15, 2020 Senior Judge Donald L. Graham no longer assigned to case. (No Criteria selected) (amb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Harris. (amb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jesse Harris. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?