Ketchens et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jones, Najia Joseph, Dontrell Hall, Zoriel Hall, Zelda Ketchens and Ursula Truxillo
Defendant: Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Line
Case Number: 1:2020cv25175
Filed: December 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 3/3/2022., Motions due by 3/7/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/29/2022., Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 7/7/2022 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2022 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Jeffrey Allen Caisse, Jr added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Caisse, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Jay Mase on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Curtis Jay Mase added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mase, Curtis)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P. Mebane on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Scott P. Mebane added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mebane, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (cds)
December 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
December 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14068919, filed by Zoriel Hall, Z.A., J.K., Ursula Truxillo, D.B., A.H., Dontrell Hall, Zelda Kethens, Anthony Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Robb, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketchens et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jones
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najia Joseph
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontrell Hall
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoriel Hall
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelda Ketchens
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Truxillo
Represented By: Michael Austin Robb
Represented By: Jessica Astrid Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Line
Represented By: Scott P. Mebane
Represented By: Curtis Jay Mase
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Caisse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?