Lucius v. Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Defendant: Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv25202
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Final Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER On Notice Of Settlement And Denying All Pending Motions As Moot. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes only. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a response on or before February 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/6/2021. (kml)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barton, Ana)
January 6, 2021 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 8 Order: Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd. response due 2/5/2021. (kpe)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Cunningham, Juan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windy Lucius identifying Other Affiliate ADASure for Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.. (kpe)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14082470, filed by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucius v. Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graff Diamonds (U.S.A.) Ltd.
Represented By: Ana Maria Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?