Quantum Supply B.V. v. Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quantum Supply B.V.
Defendant: Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv25223
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #11 , by no later than February 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
February 17, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, Motion to Dismiss Count II by Quantum Supply B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Michael Essington Mediation Hearing set for 5/5/2021 09:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 Supplemental NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Michael Essington as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/5/2021 at 9:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Michael Essington as Mediator. (Gutman, Ariella)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #11 , by no later than February 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, Motion to Dismiss Count II by Quantum Supply B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING DISCOVERY FILING re #13 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Quantum Supply B.V. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 STRICKEN Initial Disclosure(s) by Quantum Supply B.V. (Gutman, Ariella) Modified to strike per DE#14 Order on 1/28/2021 (ebz).
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.. (Thornton, Clayton)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, Motion to Dismiss Count II by Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.. Responses due by 2/3/2021 (Thornton, Clayton)
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mercury Air Cargo, Inc., filed by Quantum Supply B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gutman, Ariella)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021., Discovery due by 9/21/2021., Fact Discovery due by 9/21/2021., Expert Discovery due by 9/21/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021., Mediation Deadline 10/5/2021., In Limine Motions due by 10/13/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 10/13/2021., Motions due by 10/13/2021., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/3/2022., Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/11/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/5/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercury Air Cargo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mercury Air Group, Inc. for Mercury Air Cargo, Inc. (Thornton, Clayton)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quantum Supply B.V. identifying Corporate Parent Clover Holdings Cooperatief U.A. for Quantum Supply B.V. (Gutman, Ariella)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Quantum Supply B.V. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mercury Air Cargo, Inc., filed by Quantum Supply B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gutman, Ariella)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Mercury Air Cargo, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set Answer Due Deadline,, Set/Reset Deadlines, of Filing State Court Docket (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Thornton, Clayton)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/13/2021), Mercury Air Cargo, Inc. response due 12/30/2020., Mercury Air Cargo, Inc. response due 12/30/2020.(Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/13/2021, Motions due by 1/22/2021) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14089158, filed by Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court file, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to Request for Admissions, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Carolina Gutierrez, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court)(Thornton, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum Supply B.V. v. Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Supply B.V.
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Reiss
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Represented By: Paul Dewey Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Air Cargo, Inc.
Represented By: Clayton Wickliffe Thornton
Represented By: David Alan Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?