Benjamin v. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Mark E. Benjamin
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility, Attorney General and U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office
Case Number: 1:2021cv20054
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 SECOND SUPPLEMENTARY AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION for Summons with Hearing Date for Motion for Release Pending Trial MOTION for Hearing filed by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz)
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTARY AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to #16 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION for Summons with Hearing Date for Motion for Release Pending Trial MOTION for Hearing by Mark E. Benjamin (drz)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION for Summons with Hearing Date for Motion for Release Pending Trial MOTION for Hearing filed by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Summons with Hearing Date for Motion for Release Pending Trial by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz). Added MOTION for Hearing on 2/23/2021 (drz).
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTARY AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Attorney General, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office, Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Welch, Alicia)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment on Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus and Complaint For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Mark E. Benjamin. (drz) Modified on 1/29/2021 (drz).
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause,, by U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office, Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility, Attorney General, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Welch, Alicia)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of Attorney General, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office, Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility. Attorney Karin D. Wherry terminated.. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Secretary, Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karin D. Wherry on behalf of Attorney General, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office, Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility. Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party Secretary, Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility(pty:dft). (Wherry, Karin)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2241. Within three days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted and shall file all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of the Petition. Counsel for Respondent is requested to not caption the response as a Motion to Dismiss. The statute, 28 U.S.C. 2243, calls for a Return. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion, (DE#4 mailed to Mark E. Benjamin) (drz)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING FEE OR IFP MOTION. Filing Fee due by 2/12/2021. Motions due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed without Costs) (drz)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. (daa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Mark E. Benjamin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of the Krome Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ICE Field Director for the Miami, FL Field Office
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alicia Hayley Welch
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?