Myeress v. Top House Properties and Investments Corp et al
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Top House Properties and Investments Corp Top House Properties and Investments Corp dba Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals doing business as Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals, Roberto Barreto and Top House Properties and Investments Corp doing business as Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals
Case Number: 1:2021cv20063
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Wirth, Craig)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Philip Hess on behalf of Roberto Barreto. Attorney John Philip Hess added to party Roberto Barreto(pty:dft). (Hess, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to TOP HOUSE PROPERTIES AND INVESTMENTS CORP, ROBERTO BARRETO - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/3/2021. (ebz)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Roberto Barreto, Top House Properties and Investments Corp by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Rothman, Joel)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Top House Properties and Investments Corp served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Wirth, Craig)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Roberto Barreto served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Wirth, Craig)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Roberto Barreto, Top House Properties and Investments Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Copy of Complaint, Exhibits and AO form mailed out) (ebz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Roberto Barreto, Top House Properties and Investments Corp. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14164265, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Top House Properties and Investments Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top House Properties and Investments Corp Top House Properties and Investments Corp dba Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals doing business as Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Barreto
Represented By: John Philip Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top House Properties and Investments Corp doing business as Luxury Miami Vacation Rentals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Meir Teitelbaum
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?