Chapman v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Chapman
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20105
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc E Weiner on behalf of Robert Chapman. Attorney Marc E Weiner added to party Robert Chapman(pty:pla). (Weiner, Marc)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Chapman. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Black, Stefanie)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (bb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14180626, filed by Robert Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Black, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chapman
Represented By: Stefanie Alicia Black
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Represented By: Marc E Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?