Sneed v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Sneed
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20172
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Court Practice Upon Settlement. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by James Sneed (Gerson, Nicholas)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by James Sneed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gerson, Nicholas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Sneed. All Defendants. (Schwartz, Edward)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order On Zoom And Other Video-Conference Hearings. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Initial Planning And Scheduling Conference, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 2/26/2021, Initial Planning And Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (kpe)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14220597, filed by James Sneed. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gerson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sneed v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sneed
Represented By: David L Markel
Represented By: Edward Steven Schwartz
Represented By: Philip Maurice Gerson
Represented By: Nicholas I. Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?