Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC. v. US Melon, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC. and Joe Myers
Defendant: US Melon, LLC, John Doe #1, Ken Kodish, SHEEHYUNG SUNG, John Doe #3 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 1:2021cv20225
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 22 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Brett M. Renzenbrink; Christen M. Steimle; Brian R. Redden, mailing date 01/20/2021, (cco)
January 20, 2021 Filing 21 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
January 20, 2021 Filing 20 Case transferred in from Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00149. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: That defendant's motion to transfer #8 be, and is hereby, GRANTED. This case be TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/20/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
January 14, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #8 MOTION to Change Venue by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC (TJZ)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #12 MOTION for Brett M. Renzenbrink to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844661). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 12/28/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR and Brett M. Renzenbrink by US Mail w/ ECF Registration Form
December 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer filed in the Southern District of Florida Action)(Steimle, Christen)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The undersigned RECUSES and the matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 12/22/2020.(TJZ)cc: COR
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #11 Motion for Brian R. Redden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC and Joe Myers, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 12/15/2020. (ECO)cc: COR Modified text on 12/15/2020 (ECO).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: That the Motion for Brett M. Renzenbrink to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 is hereby taken under advisement, pending the filing of a supplement providing the necessary additional information by December 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 12/15/2020. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Attorney Brett Renzenbrink
December 8, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #12 MOTION for Brett M. Renzenbrink to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844661), #11 MOTION for Brian R. Redden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844644) (ECO)
December 8, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Brett M. Renzenbrink, Brian R. Redden re #12 MOTION for Brett M. Renzenbrink to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844661), #11 MOTION for Brian R. Redden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844644). (ECO)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Brett M. Renzenbrink to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844661)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brett M. Renzenbrink, #2 Proposed Order)(Steimle, Christen)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Brian R. Redden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4844644)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian R. Redden, #2 Proposed Order)(Steimle, Christen)
December 4, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #5 Notice to Attorney Brett M. Renzenbrink. (ECO)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Craig Stokes re #10 Reply to Response to Motion; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit A.Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (ECO)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Change Venue by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC filed by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Answer)(Stokes, Craig) Modified to correctly describe Exhibit on 12/1/2020 (ECO).
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Change Venue by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC filed by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers. (Steimle, Christen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC or Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung, US Melon, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - USDC SDFL Complaint Filed, #3 Exhibit B - Counsel Correspondence Accepting Service, #4 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, USDC SDFL, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of US Melon's Representative, #6 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC.. (Steimle, Christen)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC., Joe Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Offering Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Second Amended Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Exemplary Advancements to MSM)(Steimle, Christen)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brett M. Renzenbrink by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Data Sheet - No record found)(ECO)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
October 16, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US Melon, LLC. (ECO)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-1381. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4802429), filed by US Melon, LLC, Ken Kodish, Sheehyung Sung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Summons to Defendants, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC. v. US Melon, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Melon, LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Kodish
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEEHYUNG SUNG
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Transportation Services, LLC.
Represented By: Brian R. Redden
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brett M. Renzenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myers
Represented By: Brian R. Redden
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brett M. Renzenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?