McCAREY v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Plaintiff: THOMAS McCAREY
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20266
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS McCAREY. Celebrity Cruises Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Silverstein, Gregg)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (scn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14257652, filed by THOMAS McCAREY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Silverstein, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCAREY v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS McCAREY
Represented By: Gregg Alan Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?