BESS v. U.S.Atty General et al
Plaintiff: Danroy Bess
Defendant: John Kelly, WILLIAM BARR, U.S. Attorney General and Secretary, D.H.S.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20331
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 2:21-cv-00117, filed 02/12/2021. (bb)
February 11, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:21-cv-20331 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (amb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. This matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Danroy Bess. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED/CORRECTED Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jmd)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danroy Bess. (lk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (lk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. MOTION IFP attached., filed by Danroy Bess.(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BESS v. U.S.Atty General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danroy Bess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, D.H.S.
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?