Ariza v. Paul & Shark Florida, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Defendant: Paul & Shark Florida, Inc. and Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20524
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Victor Ariza. Paul & Shark Florida, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Hannah, Roderick)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #12 Defendants Paul & Shark Florida, Inc. and Paul & Shark USA, Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendants must file their response on or before April 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Paul & Shark Florida, Inc., Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc.. Attorney Barbara Joy Riesberg added to party Paul & Shark Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barbara Joy Riesberg added to party Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc.(pty:dft). (Riesberg, Barbara)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Hannah, Roderick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of: Particulars in Case under Americans with Disabilities Act (Verified) by Victor Ariza re #4 Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannah, Roderick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc. (drz)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) against Paul & Shark U.S.A., Inc. by Victor Ariza re #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc., filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hannah, Roderick)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. Paul & Shark Florida, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Hannah, Roderick)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference,Order Requiring Verified Statement in ADA Case and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paul & Shark Florida, Inc. (drz)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul & Shark Florida, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14350370, filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. Paul & Shark Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul & Shark Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Joy Riesberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul & Shark, U.S.A, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Joy Riesberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?