Poe Paul v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Plaintiff: Adlyn Poe Paul
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20814
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan S. Gutwein on behalf of Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Attorney Evan S. Gutwein added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc.(pty:dft). (Gutwein, Evan)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adlyn Poe Paul. Celebrity Cruises Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (Holzberg, Glenn)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (drz)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14461958, filed by Adlyn Poe Paul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe Paul v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Evan S. Gutwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlyn Poe Paul
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?