Ariza v. Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Defendant: Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv20931
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; granting #10 Motion for Default Judgment. Case Administratively Closed. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment [Final] Against Defendant Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC With Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hannah, Roderick)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #8 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/5/2021. (ail)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order re #4 Scheduling Order,, by Victor Ariza. Responses due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannah, Roderick)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Hannah, Roderick)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 4/2/2021. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2021 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC. (amb)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14507614, filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Provocateur International (US) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?