El-Gheriani v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Wail Essam El-Gheriani
Defendant: Director Varsenik Papazian, Director Tracy Renaud, Attorney General Merrick Garland, District Director BRETT RINEHART, SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States Of America, Brett Rinehart, Attorney General of the United States and Varsenik Papazian
Case Number: 1:2021cv21015
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wail Essam El-Gheriani (Lerner, Romy)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wail Essam El-Gheriani re #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, Affidavit of Service (Lerner, Romy)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #8 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued as to USA. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Varsenik Papazian. (ail)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Brett Rinehart, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States Of America (ail)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Varsenik Papazian by Wail Essam El-Gheriani (Lerner, Romy)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Image is Blank for Varsenik Papazian. (cds)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Brett Rinehart, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and United States Of America (cds)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (cds)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14523530, filed by Wail Essam El-Gheriani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Lerner, Romy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Gheriani v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Varsenik Papazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director BRETT RINEHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Rinehart
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsenik Papazian
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wail Essam El-Gheriani
Represented By: Romy Louise Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?