Securities and Exchange Commission v. MintBroker International, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: MintBroker International, LTD., f/k/a Swiss America Securities LTD. and d/b/a SureTrader, Guy Gentile, MintBroker International, Ltd. formerly known as Swiss America Securities LTD. doing business as SureTrader, Guy Gentile Nigro and Swiss America Securities LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21079
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter from Guy Gentile (ego)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Guy Gentile to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: guygentile@outlook.com. (ego)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INTERNATIONAL SERVICES re #3 Summons Issued as to MintBroker International, Ltd. Article number: IZ A37 48W DA 9825 7437. (cds)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INTERNATIONAL SERVICES re #3 Summons Issued as to MintBroker International, Ltd. Article number: lZ A37 48W DA 9863 7615 (cds)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INTERNATIONAL SERVICES re #3 Summons Issued as to MintBroker International, Ltd. Article number: 7748 5786 7699 XS NASA. (cds)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INTERNATIONAL SERVICES re #3 Summons Issued as to MintBroker International, Ltd. Article number: IZ A37 48W DA 9962 0229. (cds)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INTERNATIONAL SERVICES re #3 Summons Issued as to MintBroker International, Ltd. Article number: 7748 5775 4814 XS NASA (cds)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION SERVICE BY PUBLICATION as to Guy Gentile. (cds)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Securities and Exchange Commission re #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sum, Alice)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Agatha Diaz (ego)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting in part #8 Motion MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Amie Riggle Berlin to Withdraw as Counsel. Amie Riggle Berlin representing Securities and Exchange Commission (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amie Riggle Berlin for / by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 10/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berlin, Amie)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION For Alternative Service of Process, or, in the Alternative, for a 90-Day Extension of Time to Effectuate Service . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (cds)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for a 90-Day Extension of time to Effectuate Service by Securities and Exchange Commission. (For Image See DE#8 ) Responses due by 10/4/2021 (cds)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION For Alternative Service of Process, or, in the Alternative, for a 90-Day Extension of Time to Effectuate Service by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SEC Sues Trader Who Teased 'FYOUDOJ' License Plate - Law360, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Alice Sum, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Ty Larkin, #4 Exhibit D. Affidavits of PS Arlin Molina, #5 Exhibit E Affidavits PS Jesinette Breton, #6 Exhibit F Declaration of Fernando Fernandez, #7 Exhibit G Schedule 13G, #8 Exhibit H Affidavits PS Xenya Rivera, #9 Exhibit I Affidavits PS Juana Guerra, #10 Exhibit J Affidavits PS Ingrid Figueroa, #11 Exhibit K California Appeals Court Docs, #12 Exhibit L Bahamas Company Search, #13 Exhibit M Bahamas SCB SIA-Firms-as-of-31-July-2021, #14 Exhibit N Declaration of Jessica Weissman)(Sum, Alice)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants no later than September 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service of Process on Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 7/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sum, Alice)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Guy Gentile, MintBroker International, Ltd.. (cds)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Berlin, Amie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. MintBroker International, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MintBroker International, LTD., f/k/a Swiss America Securities LTD. and d/b/a SureTrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MintBroker International, Ltd. formerly known as Swiss America Securities LTD. doing business as SureTrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Gentile Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss America Securities LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amie Riggle Berlin
Represented By: Alice Sum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?