Benchimol-Levy v. Officer XM1915 et al
Plaintiff: Pola Benchimol-Levy
Defendant: Officer XM1915, Director, USCIS Texas Service Center and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv21099
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Pola Benchimol-Levy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Approval Notice) (Prada, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Civil Case Terminated, per #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Closing Case. (ps1)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 9 Order directing the parties to submit suggested deadlines for the filing of the administrative record and motions for summary judgment. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (ps1)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of Officer XM1915, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Officer XM1915(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, See DE#'s 5 and 6 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
April 5, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 9 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ps1)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Pola Benchimol-Levy. Office of the Chief Counsel served on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Assistant Attorney General for Administration served on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (For Image See DE#4 ) (cds)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Pola Benchimol-Levy. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (For Image See DE#4 ) (cds)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pola Benchimol-Levy re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Prada, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Officer XM1915, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Director, USCIS Texas Service Center, Officer XM1915. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14543581, filed by Pola Benchimol-Levy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Appendix)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchimol-Levy v. Officer XM1915 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer XM1915
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS Texas Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pola Benchimol-Levy
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?