Wells Fargo Bank N.A. v. Kraushaar et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Defendant: Max Kraushaar and Olinda Kraushaar
Case Number: 1:2021cv21156
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #8 Transmittal Letter Sent. (scn)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter Sent with DE#7 to: Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. State Court Case Number: 16-028602-CA-01. (scn)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Power to Sanction, and for Reasonable Fees and Costs filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. The above-styled case is REMANDED to Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court for Sanctions Pursuant to the Court's Inherent Power to Sanction, and for Reasonable Fees and Costs by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Attorney Jan Timothy Williams added to party Wells Fargo Bank N.A.(pty:pla). (Williams, Jan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (scn)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (scn)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Foreclosure) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14555290, filed by Olinda Kraushaar, Max Kraushaar.(Marrero, Julio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. v. Kraushaar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Kraushaar
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olinda Kraushaar
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jan Timothy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?