Perri et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Perri, Ryan Heitz and Kevin Sheehan
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21266
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Consol Plaintiffs Taylor Perri, Ryan Heitz, and Kevin Sheehan are dismissed from this action without prejudice re (194 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21266-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00234 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21266-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-00234. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel Transfer Order transferring case to: Southern District of Florida. MDL case number: 2989. (AG)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 the Parties' Joint Motion for Stay Pending MDL Status. This action is hereby STAYED pending the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the pending motion to transfer in In re Short Squeeze Antitrust Litigation (MDL No. 2989). The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case pending the resolution of the motion to transfer. If the case is not transferred, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date the motion to transfer is denied. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/3/2021. (MWC)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Status by All Defendants. (Webb, Joshua)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Taylor Perri, Kevin Sheehan, Ryan Heitz as to Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Halpern, Jeremy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Taylor Perri, Kevin Sheehan, Ryan Heitz as to Robinhood Financial LLC. (Halpern, Jeremy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Taylor Perri, Kevin Sheehan, Ryan Heitz as to Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Halpern, Jeremy) Modified on 2/8/2021 (TDC).
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. New case number: 8:21-cv-234-T-35JSS. Judge William F. Jung no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: The undersigned recuses himself from presiding on this case. The Clerk will randomly reassign the matter. I have had extensive discussions about this matter outside of court and have earlier read up on it in the media in matters outside of the four corners of this law suit; which suit just came to my attention. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/2/2021. (Jung, William)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (LNR)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-0234-WFJ-JSS. (SJB)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17828303) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Customer Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Robinhood Markets, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Robinhood Securities, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Robinhood Financial LLC)(Taaffe, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perri et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Perri
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Heitz
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sheehan
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?